IL HR1276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Endorses and supports the Screen at 23 campaign and urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to endorse and support the Screen at 23 campaign's efforts to increase awareness of diabetes among Asian American communities, including using appropriate screening measures for Asian American patients, and to eliminate disparities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCREEN AT 23-SUPPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-27HouseRecommends Be Adopted Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee; 003-000-000
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Health & Healthcare Disparities Committee
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback