IL HR1257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Mourns the death of Shirley McCombs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEMORIAL-SHIRLEY MCCOMBS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2018-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-11-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-10-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-10-22HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-10-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-10-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-10-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-10-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-10-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback