IL HR1257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the death of Shirley McCombs.
Title
MEMORIAL-SHIRLEY MCCOMBS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2018-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-11-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-10-22 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-10-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-10-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-10-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-10-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-10-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1257&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1257.htm |