IL HR1244 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates Dr. Karen Hunter Anderson on her retirement as the Illinois Community College Board Executive Director.
Title
CONGRATS-DR. KAREN ANDERSON
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Rep. Sara Jimenez [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2018-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-10-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1244&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1244.htm |