IL HR1225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to pass the Butch Lewis Act, which would create the Pension Rehabilitation Administration, an agency of the United States Department of the Treasury.
Title
PASS BUTCH LEWIS ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Helene Miller Walsh [R] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-14 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-09-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1225&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1225.htm |