IL HR1225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the United States Congress to pass the Butch Lewis Act, which would create the Pension Rehabilitation Administration, an agency of the United States Department of the Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PASS BUTCH LEWIS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-27HouseRecommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-11-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-11-14HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-09-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback