IL HR1216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of the average denial rate of hospitals throughout Illinois in both the fee-for-service and managed care programs, with at least 50% of the audit consisting of safety-net and critical access hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MCO-DENIAL RATE-AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-10-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-10-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-10-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-10-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-09-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-09-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-09-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-09-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-09-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-09-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-09-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback