IL HR1216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of the average denial rate of hospitals throughout Illinois in both the fee-for-service and managed care programs, with at least 50% of the audit consisting of safety-net and critical access hospitals.
Title
MCO-DENIAL RATE-AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-10-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-09-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-09-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-09-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-09-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-09-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-09-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-09-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1216&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1216.htm |