IL HR1188 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois Department of Transportation to study the merits of acquiring additional passenger railcars in advance of the Next Generation deliveries and issue a written report of its findings.
Title
IDOT NEXT GEN SUPPLEMENT STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-08-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-08-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1188&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1188.htm |