IL HR1188 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 25, 2010, as a date honoring the 10th Illinois Volunteer Cavalry Regiment in the State of Illinois.
Title
10TH ILLINOIS CAVALRY-REMUSTER
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2010-11-30 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-11-30 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-11-29 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-04-30 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1188&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR1188.htm |