IL HR1186 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor, the Director of the Illinois Department of Agriculture, and the members of the Illinois Congressional delegation to take all action possible to encourage the U.S. Secretary of Agriculture to immediately allow filter strips to be recognized as a conservation practice eligible for emergency haying and grazing in Illinois.
Title
EMERGENCY HAYING-FILTER STRIPS
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Rep. Pam Roth [R] | Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
Rep. Richard Morthland [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-08-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-08-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-08-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1186&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1186.htm |