IL HR1178 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Governor Bruce Rauner to reverse his previous stance by pledging that no state resources will be used to assist the Trump Administration in carrying out its policies at the border, and that he call on the Acting Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security to fully investigate how the thousands of young children currently detained are going to be reunited with their families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U.S. BORDER POLICIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-06-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback