IL HR1178 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor Bruce Rauner to reverse his previous stance by pledging that no state resources will be used to assist the Trump Administration in carrying out its policies at the border, and that he call on the Acting Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security to fully investigate how the thousands of young children currently detained are going to be reunited with their families.
Title
U.S. BORDER POLICIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-06-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-06-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-06-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1178&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1178.htm |