IL HR1161 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 27, 2016 as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day. Designates June of 2016 as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month. Urged the Department of Public Health and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs to continue working to educate victims of abuse, crime, and natural disasters, service members, veterans and their families, and the general public, about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of post-traumatic stress injury.
Title
PTSI DAY/MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1161&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1161.htm |