IL HR1120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy and the work of stakeholders on the continued implementation of the Strategy.
Title
NUTRIENT LOSS REDUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-09-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1120&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1120.htm |