IL HR1120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy and the work of stakeholders on the continued implementation of the Strategy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NUTRIENT LOSS REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-09-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-08-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-25HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback