IL HR1117 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes November 4, 2018 as the 75th anniversary of the "birth" of the G.I. Bill of Rights (officially known as the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944) at the Luther B. Easley Post 128 of the American Legion in Salem.
Title
GI BILL-75TH ANNIVERSARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1117&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1117.htm |