IL HR1116 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the State Board of Education to stop using edTPA as the teacher certification for licensure.
Title
STATE BOARD OF ED-NO EDTPA
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1116&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1116.htm |