IL HR1114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends School Resource Officer Mark Dallas and the students and staff at Dixon High School for their heroic actions on May 16, 2018.
Title
COMMEND-OFFICER MARK DALLAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2018-05-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1114&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1114.htm |