IL HR1113 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports Route 66 being named a National Historic Trail in accordance with House Resolution 801 introduced by U.S. Congressman Darin LaHood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROUTE 66-NAT. HISTORIC TRAIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback