IL HR1098 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Black History Curriculum Task Force to conduct an audit of every Illinois school district's history curriculum from K-12 to review the following: (1) Does the district's curricular material no matter the format contain a current unit on African American history, (2) At what grade school level does the district begin teaching African American history, (3) At what level does the district stop teaching African American history, (4) Does standardized testing include material on African American history, and if so, at what levels, and (5) What is ISBE's position on teaching African American history, what are their protocols, and what are their penalties if their instructions are not being followed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLACK HISTORY TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-24HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback