IL HR1078 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Acknowledges May of 2018 as Asian American and Pacific Islander Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASIAN AMERICAN HERITAGE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback