IL HR1076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cautions Wisconsin to not hastily approve permits for Foxconn Technology Group without proper environmental and public health impact studies.
Title
CAUTION FOXCONN TECH PERMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1076&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1076.htm |