IL HR1072 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the week of August 26 - September 1, 2012, as "Workforce Development Week" in the State of Illinois.
Title
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT WEEK
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-05-31 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-05-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1072&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1072.htm |