IL HR1071 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes Megan Bugg for her efforts to raise awareness of childhood cancer and fight for increased funding for research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECOGNIZE-MEGAN BUGG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseResolution Adopted
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House
2018-05-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-16HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback