IL HR1070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Illinois State Board of Education to conduct an audit of every Illinois school district's history curriculum from K-12 to review the following: (1) Does the district's curricular material in any format contain a current unit on African American history, (2) At what grade school level does the district begin teaching African American history, (3) At what level does the district stop teaching African American history, (4) Does standardized testing include material on African American history, and if so, at what levels, and (5) What is ISBE's position on teaching African American history, what are their protocols, and what are their penalties if their instructions are not being followed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISBE-BLACK HISTORY AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-11-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-11-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2018-11-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback