IL HR1070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois State Board of Education to conduct an audit of every Illinois school district's history curriculum from K-12 to review the following: (1) Does the district's curricular material in any format contain a current unit on African American history, (2) At what grade school level does the district begin teaching African American history, (3) At what level does the district stop teaching African American history, (4) Does standardized testing include material on African American history, and if so, at what levels, and (5) What is ISBE's position on teaching African American history, what are their protocols, and what are their penalties if their instructions are not being followed.
Title
ISBE-BLACK HISTORY AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-11-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1070&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1070.htm |