IL HR1051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Board of Higher Education to conduct a study in regards to the governance structure of the Southern Illinois University system and the feasibility and viability of becoming two distinct universities with separate Boards of Trustees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDY SIU GOVERNANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-007-001
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback