IL HR1051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Board of Higher Education to conduct a study in regards to the governance structure of the Southern Illinois University system and the feasibility and viability of becoming two distinct universities with separate Boards of Trustees.
Title
STUDY SIU GOVERNANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-007-001 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1051&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1051.htm |