IL HR1050 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November of 2018 as "Alzheimer's Awareness Month".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALZHEIMER'S AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-23HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback