IL HR1046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of May of 2018 as Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CF AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback