IL HR1044 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the week of May 13 - May 19, 2018 as "Food Allergy Awareness Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD ALLERGY AWARENESS WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback