IL HR1031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognize the tremendous accomplishments of Ulysses S. Grant during his service to the United States as both president and military officer. Declares November 3, 2018 as President Ulysses S. Grant Day in the State of Illinois in honor of his achievements and in commemoration of the 150th anniversary of his election as president.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRES. U.S. GRANT DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback