IL HR1025 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Resolution Adopted 061-052-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports the implementation of a progressive income tax in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROGRESSIVE INCOME TAX-SUPPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseResolution Adopted 061-052-000
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-02HouseRecommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-003-001
2018-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback