IL HR1017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that there are significant disparities in college degree completion rates for low-income and first generation college students and students of color at institutions across the State. Commits to closing statewide racial and socioeconomic degree attainment gaps and institutional achievement gaps and encourages institutions of higher education to implement and expand existing student success efforts that have evidence of improving educational outcomes for low-income and first generation college students and students of color. Urges the State's P20 Council is to update the State's 60 by 25 goal to include equity-focused targets aimed at closing institutional racial and socioeconomic achievement gaps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLEGE COMPLETION RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HouseResolution Adopted
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-14HouseRecommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback