IL HR0991 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopts the text of a Tennessee resolution condemning white nationalism and neo-Nazism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDEMN WHITE NATIONALISM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback