IL HR0991 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the text of a Tennessee resolution condemning white nationalism and neo-Nazism.
Title
CONDEMN WHITE NATIONALISM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=991&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0991.htm |