IL HR0986 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Department of Child and Family Services to immediately resume its 35-year precedent of issuing monthly child abuse reports and executive statistical summary reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-CHILD ABUSE REPORTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback