IL HR0980 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the date of May 9, 2018 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day in the State of Illinois in honor of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, and its work.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=980&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0980.htm |