IL HR0972 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes May of 2018 as "Foster Care Month" in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOSTER CARE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback