IL HR0971 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to contract with an external expert entity that has prior experience collecting statewide mammography quality data to perform the Department's quality improvement program and to provide each participating facility with a mammography quality report annually. Urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to contract with an external expert entity that has prior experience collecting breast cancer treatment data from safety net providers in Illinois and is a federally designated Patient Safety and Quality Improvement Organization. Urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to immediately implement all other components of the BEST Act and to work with breast cancer advocates and breast cancer clinical experts to ensure that the Illinois Medicaid program provides the highest quality breast cancer screening and treatment to women served by Illinois Medicaid.
Title
BEST ACT-DHS IMPLEMENTATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=971&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0971.htm |