IL HR0967 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February of 2016 as "Career and Technical Education Month" in the State of Illinois.
Title
CAREER AND TECHNICAL ED MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 024-000-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=967&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0967.htm |