IL HR0965 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes the African Methodist Episcopal (AME) Day at the Capitol on April 18, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AME DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback