IL HR0918 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Internal Revenue Service to classify fire sprinkler retrofits as five-year property for the purposes of depreciation under the federal Modified Accelerated Cost-Recovery System.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLERS-MACRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=918&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0918.htm |