IL HR0915 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages Delta Airlines to consider Illinois as a destination to relocate their business headquarters and fleet of aircraft.
Title
DELTA AIRLINES-RELOCATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=915&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0915.htm |