IL HR0911 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes "National Domestic Violence Awareness Month" in October of 2018 and supports and commends the efforts of those people and organizations who work tirelessly to help victims break free of the devastating effects of domestic abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AWARE MTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback