IL HR0911 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes "National Domestic Violence Awareness Month" in October of 2018 and supports and commends the efforts of those people and organizations who work tirelessly to help victims break free of the devastating effects of domestic abuse.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AWARE MTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=911&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0911.htm |