IL HR0908 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commends the National Association of Chemical Distributors and its Illinois members for their over 25-year commitment to Responsible Distribution including community outreach, pollution prevention and ensuring the safety and security of chemical handling and distribution throughout the Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMEND-NACD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback