IL HR0906 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recommends the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency withdraw its draft Beneficiary Mitigation Plan. Recommends the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, prior to submitting the State of Illinois' final Beneficiary Mitigation Plant to the Trustee, extend its arbitrary public comment period through June 30, 2018, to allow sufficient time for transparent and open public hearings. Recommends the establishment of the Illinois Volkswagen Environmental Beneficiary Mitigation Plan Task Force to be comprised of stakeholders from all eligible vehicles classifications included in the Volkswagen Environmental Mitigation Trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOLKSWAGEN SETTLEMENT TRUST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-03-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback