IL HR0898 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Mental Diagnosis and Illinois Law within the Office of the Governor.
Title
CREATES-TASK FORCE MENTAL DIAG
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Deborah Mell [D] | Rep. Derrick Smith [D] |
Rep. Constance Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2012-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-03-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=898&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0898.htm |